Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE46975T | 15.10.1989 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3301282 | 17.01.1983 | EP84100363 | 14.01.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3480033D1 | 09.11.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3480033 | 14.01.1984 | DE3301282 | 17.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0114073 | Global Dossier | 04.10.1989 | B1 | EP0114073 | 22.07.1987 | A3 | EP0114073 | 25.07.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3301282 | 17.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3301282 | 19.07.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3301282 | 17.01.1983 |