EP0114073 - Method and device for message transmission between automation means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferling, Heinz-Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Semder Weg 12 D-6115 Altheim / DE | [1984/30] | Representative(s) | Lertes, Kurt, et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/30] | Lertes, Kurt, Dr., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100363.5 | 14.01.1984 | [1984/30] | Priority number, date | DE19833301282 | 17.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3301282 | [1984/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114073 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114073 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114073 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [1984/30] | CPC: |
G06F13/387 (EP);
G06F15/17381 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Nachrichten zwischen Automatisierungsmitteln | [1984/30] | English: | Method and device for message transmission between automation means | [1984/30] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la transmission de messages entre moyens d'automatisation | [1984/30] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 31.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE876025 (BELL TELEPHONE MFG) | [A] - LOCAL NETWORKS FOR COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE IFIP WORKING GROUP 6.4, Zürich, 27.-29. August 1980, Seiten 319-354, IFIP, Amsterdam, NL; R.F. RASHID: "An inter-process communication facility for unix" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 17, Nr. 4, September 1974, Seiten 991,992, New York, US; T.R. EDEL et al.: "Standard network functional protocol" |