Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE34856T | 15.06.1988 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | EP84100397 | 16.01.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3471777D1 | 07.07.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | DE3471777 | 16.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0120194 | Global Dossier | 01.06.1988 | B1 | EP0120194 | 10.07.1985 | A3 | EP0120194 | 03.10.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3302940 | 02.08.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8500476 | 01.10.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS59142612 | 15.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO167112B | 24.06.1991 | B | NO834726L | 30.07.1984 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4627025 | 02.12.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3302940 | 28.01.1983 |