Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0118685 | Global Dossier | 19.09.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP16844283 | 14.09.1983 | JP1860083 | 07.02.1983 | JP2939083 | 25.02.1983 | JP12347083 | 08.07.1983 | JP2128183 | 10.02.1983 | JP12347183 | 08.07.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0242822B | 26.09.1990 | B2 | JPS6061555 | 09.04.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16844283 | 14.09.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0250105B | 01.11.1990 | B2 | JPS6016961 | 28.01.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12347083 | 08.07.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0259818B | 13.12.1990 | B2 | JPS59144731 | 18.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP1860083 | 07.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0261929B | 21.12.1990 | B2 | JPS59157051 | 06.09.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2939083 | 25.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0438739B | 25.06.1992 | B2 | JPS59134748 | 02.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP611083 | 18.01.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0438740B | 25.06.1992 | B2 | JPS59148733 | 25.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2128183 | 10.02.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6016983 | 28.01.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12347183 | 08.07.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0117412 | Global Dossier | 05.09.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP16844283 | 14.09.1983 | JP1860083 | 07.02.1983 | JP611083 | 18.01.1983 | JP2939083 | 25.02.1983 | JP12347083 | 08.07.1983 | JP2128183 | 10.02.1983 | JP12347183 | 08.07.1983 |