EP0117412 - Propene derivatives and their use as plant growth inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.1987 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | ||
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. Tokyo Head Office 8-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagihara, Hiroshi 1177, Matogata Matogata-cho Himegi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Hirako, Yoshiyuki 500, Kamiyobe Yobe-ku Himeji Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Morishima, Yasuo 6-11, 3-chome, Tsutsujigaoka Tarumi-ku Kobe / JP | 04 /
Masamoto, Kazuhisa 500, Kamiyobe Yobe-ku Himeji Hyogo / JP | [1984/36] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100497.1 | 18.01.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | JP19830006110 | 18.01.1983 Original published format: JP 611083 | JP19830018600 | 07.02.1983 Original published format: JP 1860083 | JP19830021281 | 10.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2128183 | JP19830029390 | 25.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2939083 | JP19830123470 | 08.07.1983 Original published format: JP 12347083 | JP19830123471 | 08.07.1983 Original published format: JP 12347183 | JP19830168442 | 14.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16844283 | [1984/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117412 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/66, C07C69/736, C07C101/28, C07C101/453, C07C103/58, C07C101/34, C07C101/44, C07C143/80, C07C149/32, C07D213/62, C07D239/32 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
C07D213/643 (EP);
C07C255/00 (EP);
C07C321/00 (EP);
C07C323/00 (EP);
C07C327/00 (EP);
C07C59/68 (EP);
C07D213/70 (EP);
C07D213/74 (EP);
C07D215/20 (EP);
C07D215/227 (EP);
C07D215/26 (EP);
C07D239/34 (EP);
C07D239/38 (EP);
C07D241/44 (EP);
C07D277/68 (EP);
C07D277/74 (EP);
C07D277/82 (EP);
C07D311/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/36] | Title | German: | Propenderivate und ihre Verwendung als Pflanzenwachstumshemmer | [1984/36] | English: | Propene derivatives and their use as plant growth inhibitors | [1984/36] | French: | Dérivés du propène et leur utilisation comme inhibiteurs de la croissance de plantes | [1984/36] | File destroyed: | 11.05.1993 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1984/36: Ein Antrag nach Regel 88 EPU zur Aufnahme der fehlenden Seite 6 in die ursprünglich eingereichte Beschreibung vom 18.01.84 ist am 23.02.84 eingegangen. | EPB 1984/36: A request under Rule 88 EPC for including the missing page 6 into the, on 18.01.84 originally filed specification has been received on 23.02.84 | EPB 1984/36: Une requête selon la Règle 88 CBE pour inclure la page 6 manquante dans la description originale déposée le 18.01.84, a été reçue le 23.02.84 | Examination procedure | 02.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 30.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/28] | 12.02.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0044972 ; | [A]DE1965872 ; | [A]FR849822 ; | [A]DE1468344 ; | [A]GB1422722 ; | [A]EP0060607 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 10, September 7, 1981, Columbus, Ohio, USA F.E. WARD et al., "Antimicrobial 3-methylene flavanones" pages 110,111 abstract no. 91 568s; & J. MED. CHEM. 1981, 24(9), 1073-7 |