EP0114695 - DNA coding for a signal amino acid sequence and vectors containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/31] | DNA coding for a signal amino acid sequence and DNA containing the same | ||
[1989/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamane, Kunio 614-201, Takezono 3-chome Sakura-mura Niihari-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | For all designated states The Calpis Food Industry Co., Ltd. 20-3, 2-chome Ebisu-Nishi Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states Yamane, Kunio 614-201, Takezono 3-chome Sakura-mura Niihari-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states The Calpis Food Industry Co., Ltd. 20-3, 2-chome Ebisu-Nishi Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamane, Kunio 614-201, Takezono 3-chome Sakura-mura Niihari-gun Ibaragi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohmura, Kazutaka 3-3-14, Kita-Kashiwa Kashiwa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakayama, Akira 2390, Oaza-Migimomi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaragi-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeichi, Yasutoshi 4-11-6, Hon-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Thomsen, Dieter Patentanwalt Postfach 70 19 29 81319 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | Thomsen, Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 70 19 29 D-81319 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/04] | Thomsen, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat. Patentanwälte Dr. D. Thomsen, W. Weinkauf, H. Hering Bahnhofstrasse 7 D-8033 Planegg / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Thomsen, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat. Patentanwälte Dr. D. Thomsen, W. Weinkauff, H. Hering Bahnhofstrasse 7 D-8033 Planegg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100640.6 | 23.01.1984 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | JP19830010088 | 25.01.1983 Original published format: JP 1008883 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114695 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114695 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114695 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C07H21/04 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
C12N9/2417 (EP,US);
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
Y10S930/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Für eine Signal-Aminosäuresequenz kodierende DNS und diese Sequenz enthaltende Vektoren | [1989/16] | English: | DNA coding for a signal amino acid sequence and vectors containing the same | [1989/16] | French: | ADN codant pour une séquence d'acides aminés à fonction signal et vecteurs contenant cette séquence | [1989/16] |
Former [1984/31] | Für eine Signal-Aminosäuresequenz kodierende DNS und diese Sequenz enthaltende DNS | ||
Former [1984/31] | DNA coding for a signal amino acid sequence and DNA containing the same | ||
Former [1984/31] | ADN codant pour une séquence d'acides aminés à fonction signal et ADN contenant cette séquence | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 24.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 09.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 47, no. 1, January 1983, pages 159-161; Y. TAKEICHI et al.: "Cloning of Bacillus subtilis alpha-amylase structural gene in plasmid pUB110" | [XP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, vol. 79, September 1982, pages 5582-5586; I. PALVA et al.: "Secretion of Escherichia coli beta-lactamase from Bacillus subtilis by the aid of alpha-amylase signal sequence" | [XP] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 112, no. 2, 29th April 1983, pages 678-683, Academic Press, Inc.; K. OHMURA et al.: "Nucleotide sequence of the promotor and NH2-terminal signal peptide region of Bacillus subtilis alpha-amylase gene cloned in pUB110" | [XP] - JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, vol. 156, no. 1, October 1983, pages 327-337, American Society for Microbiology; H. YAMAZAKI et al.: "alpha-Amylase genes (amyR2 and amyE+) from an alpha-amylase-hyperproducing Bacillus subtilis strain: molecular cloning and nucleotide sequences" | [XP] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 11, no. 2, 25th January 1983, pages 237-249, IRL Press Ltd., Oxford, GB; M. YANG et al.: "Nucleotide sequence of the amylase gene from Bacillus subtilis" | [ ] - J. BIOCHEM. vol. 95, no. 1, 1984, pages 87-93; K. OHMURA et al.: "A Bacillus subtilis secretion vector system derived from the B. subtilis alpha-amylase promoter and signal sequence region, and secretion of Escherichia coli beta-lactamase by the vector system" |