EP0118689 - Bench for manually equipping printed circuit supports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFAG A.G. für automatische Fertigungstechnik Fiechtenstrasse 32 CH-4950 Huttwil / CH | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | [1987/07] |
Former [1984/38] | For:CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
SE
International Standard Electric Corporation 320 Park Avenue New York New York 10022 / US | ||
For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuehn, Volker Bülowstrasse 15 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | 02 /
Rothfuss, Werner Carl-Peter-Strasse 40 D-7015 Korntal-Münchingen 1 / DE | 03 /
Widmaier, Richard Teckstrasse 4 D-7014 Kornwestheim / DE | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean S. 51, route du Prieur 1257 Landecy (Genève) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/07] | Robert, Jean S. 51, route du Prieur CH-1257 Landecy (Genève) / CH | ||
Former [1984/38] | Gähr, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100641.4 | 21.01.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | DE19833303951 | 05.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3303951 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118689 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118689 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
H05K13/0053 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1744 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53174 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53178 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53261 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Bestückungstisch zum manuellen Bestücken von Schaltungsträgern | [1984/38] | English: | Bench for manually equipping printed circuit supports | [1984/38] | French: | Banc de montage pour équiper manuellement des supports de circuits imprimés | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 30.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/30] | 14.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2105224 (USM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0128888 (SINCOTRON APS [DK]); | [A]WO8402052 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2414844 (RECH CONST ELECTRO ET [FR]); | [A]GB2129776 (USM CORP); | [A]DE1281510 (MOHAWK DATA SCIENCES CORP) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 27, Nr. 2, Juli 1984, Seiten 1298,1299, New York, US; G.W. BOOTH: "Semi-automatic card assembly tool with clinch attachment" |