EP0151191 - Photosensitive material for the production of orginals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN HOECHST CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1985/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walls, John E. 46, Center Street Annandale, N.J. 08801 / US | 02 /
Dhillon, Major S. 896 Merrit Dr. Hillsborough, N.J. 08876 / US | [1985/33] | Representative(s) | Euler, Kurt Emil, et al KALLE Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | Euler, Kurt Emil, Dr., et al KALLE Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100741.2 | 25.01.1984 | [1985/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151191 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03F7/08 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
G03F1/56 (EP);
G03F7/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/33] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliches Material zur Herstellung von Kopiervorlagen | [1985/33] | English: | Photosensitive material for the production of orginals | [1985/33] | French: | Matériel photosensible pour la fabrication d'originaux | [1985/33] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 24.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58060737 ; | [X]US3679419 ; | [X]EP0096326 ; | [X]EP0061150 ; | [X]GB1525757 ; | [XD]GB1313777 ; | [A]EP0017563 ; | [A]EP0061319 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 150(P-207)(1295), 30. Juni 1983; & JP-A-58 060 737 (TOYO BOSEKI K.K.) 11.04.1983, & JP58060737 A 00000000 |