EP0115340 - Sectional steel machining installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.02.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Muhr und Bender Kölner Strasse 99 D-57439 Attendorn / DE | [1984/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roschiwal, Helmut Ulrichsmahd 16 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Herbert Eichenstrasse 13 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Schink, Karl Heidenstrasse 12 D-5952 Attendorn-Dünschede / DE | [1984/32] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter, et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener, Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100817.0 | 26.01.1984 | [1984/32] | Priority number, date | DE19833303319 | 01.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3303319 | [1984/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115340 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115340 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115340 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23B41/00, B23Q37/00 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
B23Q1/60 (EP,US);
B23B41/003 (EP,US);
B23Q37/00 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US);
Y10T408/38 (EP,US);
Y10T408/3811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/32] | Title | German: | Profilstahlbearbeitungsanlage | [1984/32] | English: | Sectional steel machining installation | [1984/32] | French: | Installation d'usinage de profilés en acier | [1984/32] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/07] | 08.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Peddinghaus, Paul Ferd. Hasslinghauser Str. 156 5820 Gevelsberg / DE Opponent's representative Honke, Manfred, et al, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.05.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Peddinghaus, Paul Ferd. Hasslinghauser Str. 156 5820 Gevelsberg / DE Opponent's representative Honke, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | 10.10.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.04.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.11.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.02.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/15] | Appeal following opposition | 11.02.1992 | Appeal received No. T0171/92 | 30.04.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.01.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/04] | 04.02.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 04.02.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1989 | DE | 01.10.1992 | AT | 26.01.1993 | GB | 26.01.1993 | SE | 27.01.1993 | BE | 31.01.1993 | CH | 31.01.1993 | LI | 31.01.1993 | NL | 01.08.1993 | FR | 30.09.1993 | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/25] | DE | 01.10.1992 | |
AT | 26.01.1993 | ||
GB | 26.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
CH | 31.01.1993 | ||
LI | 31.01.1993 | ||
NL | 01.08.1993 | ||
FR | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | DE | 01.10.1992 | |
GB | 26.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
CH | 31.01.1993 | ||
LI | 31.01.1993 | ||
NL | 01.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | DE | 01.10.1992 | |
GB | 26.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
NL | 01.08.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | DE | 01.10.1992 | |
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
NL | 01.08.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | DE | 01.10.1992 | |
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | DE | 01.10.1992 | |
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/15] | DE | 01.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR486277 (LOUIS MIQUET [FR]); | [A]US3253484 (HILL WALTER P); | [A]US3548686 (MARKS THEODORE); | [A]US3735907 (KUCHAR W E, et al); | [Y]US3934963 (LANGLOIS CHRISTIAN); | [A]US4102592 (MACKINDER HAROLD C); | [A]DE2722073 (SCHEER & CIE C F) | Examination | JPS4716475U |