EP0116880 - Separable bottom-end-stop assembly for separable slide fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akashi, Shunji 67-3, Tateno Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Okazaki, Fumio 146-5, Inuyama Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/35] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101072.1 | 02.02.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | JP19830013834U | 02.02.1983 Original published format: JP 1383483 U | JP19830120982U | 03.08.1983 Original published format: JP 12098283 U | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116880 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116880 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/38 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
A44B19/38 (EP);
A44B19/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Unteres Endglied für einen trennbaren Reissverschluss | [1984/35] | English: | Separable bottom-end-stop assembly for separable slide fastener | [1984/35] | French: | Butée d'extrémité inférieure pour fermeture à glissière du type séperable | [1984/35] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH626241 (AMMER ALFRED [CH]); | [X]US4112553 (WEITZNER JONAS); | [A]DE2010626 ; | [A]FR2082871 (FFLB); | [A]US2474908 (MORIN LOUIS H) |