EP0123796 - Method of producing epoxy esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeSOTO, INC. 1700 South Mt. Prospect Road Des Plaines Illinois 60018 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states DeSOTO, INC. 1700 South Mt. Prospect Road Des Plaines Illinois 60018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekmakas, Kazys 203 N. Flake Drive Palatine, Ill., 60067 / US | 02 /
Shah, Raj 1335 Concordia Lane Schaumburg, Ill., 60172 / US | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101138.0 | 04.02.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19830484508 | 13.04.1983 Original published format: US 484508 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123796 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123796 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/16, C09D3/58, C08L63/10 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
C08G59/1472 (EP);
C09D163/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epoxyestern | [1984/45] | English: | Method of producing epoxy esters | [1984/45] | French: | Méthode de production d'époxy-esters | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 21.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3553119 ; | [Y]US2909497 (EDELMAN LEONARD E); | [Y]US3954688 |