EP0120251 - Method and device for enveloping preferably quadrangular objects with a tape-like enveloping material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferag AG CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | [1984/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benz, Gottlieb Stox CH-8890 Flums / CH | 02 /
Stauber, Hans-Ulrich Neugutstrasse CH-8624 Grüt / CH | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 84101408.7 | 11.02.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | CH19830001543 | 22.03.1983 Original published format: CH 154383 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120251 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120251 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/10 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
B65B11/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umwickeln von vorzugsweise quaderförmigen Gegenständen mit einem bahnförmigen Umwickelmaterial | [1984/40] | English: | Method and device for enveloping preferably quadrangular objects with a tape-like enveloping material | [1984/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'enveloppement d'objets de préférence quadrangulaires avec un matériau d'emballage sous forme de bande | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 04.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3469368 (CHURCHILL IVAN F, et al); | [X]DE1761851 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) |