EP0118058 - Process and apparatus for the destruction of liquid or pasty waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | For all designated states Deutsche Babcock Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 D-4200 Oberhausen 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Killinger, Erich Paracelsusstrasse 29 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen/Oberaichen / DE | [1984/37] | Representative(s) | Müller, Jürgen Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | Müller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Babcock AG Lizenz- und Patentabteilung Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101426.9 | 11.02.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | DE19833307737 | 04.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3307737 | [1984/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118058 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118058 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C10B53/00, F23G5/02 | [1984/37] | CPC: |
C10B47/30 (EP);
C10B53/00 (EP);
F23G5/0273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vernichtung von flüssigen oder pastenförmigen Abfallstoffen | [1984/37] | English: | Process and apparatus for the destruction of liquid or pasty waste | [1984/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la destruction de déchets liquides ou pâteux | [1984/37] | File destroyed: | 11.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/34] | 17.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0111081 ; | [X]US3780676 ; | [A]DE2512461 ; | [A]FR2505029 ; | [A]DE2925202 |