EP0117476 - Tetrahydropyranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eidenschink, Rudolf, Dr. Erlenweg 17 D-6110 Dieburg / DE | 02 /
Krause, Joachim, Dr. Samuel-Morse-Strasse 14 D-6110 Dieburg / DE | 03 /
Fuss, Peter, Dr. Im Seegraben 5 D-6109 Mühltal-Traisa / DE | [1984/36] | Application number, filing date | 84101456.6 | 13.02.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | DE19833306960 | 28.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3306960 | [1984/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117476 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117476 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/04, C07D309/06, C07D309/10, C07D309/12, C07D309/30, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D407/04, C07D407/06, C07D405/12, C07D407/12 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
C07D407/04 (EP,US);
C07D309/04 (EP,US);
C07D309/06 (EP,US);
C07D309/30 (EP,US);
C09K19/3402 (EP,US);
C09K19/3441 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1984/36] | Title | German: | Tetrahydropyrane | [1984/36] | English: | Tetrahydropyranes | [1984/36] | French: | Tétrahydropyrannes | [1984/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 26.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 96, No. 15, 12. April 1982, Columbus, Ohio, USA DANHEISER Rick L., MORIN John M. Jr. YU Melvin, BASAK Ajoy "Cationic cyclizations initiated by electrocyclic cleavage of cyclopropanes. Synthesis of lactones, tetrahydropyrans, and tetrahydrofurans" Seite 677, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung-No. 122 569v | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 95, No. 11,14. September 1981, Columbus, Ohio, USA CORBIN Dale H, HOBBS Gregory D, WOODYARD James D. "Stereochemical assignments of the 7-phenyl-3-oxabicyclo(4.1.0)heptanes" Seite 573, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-No. 96 858w | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 93, No. 25, 22. Dezember 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA JAKOVAC Ignac J, NG George, LOK Kar P., JONES J. Bryan "Preparation of useful chiral lactone synthons via stereospecific enzyme-catalyzed oxidations of meso-diols" Seite 800, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-No. 238 869k | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 91, No. 3, 16. Juli 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA FICINI Jacqueline, KAHN Philippe, FALOU Samir, TOUZIN Anne Marie "Generation and synthetic use of 2,3-dihydropyran-3-yl lithium" Seite 630, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung-No. 20 243p | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 90, No. 23, 4. June 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA HAENSEL Rudolf, SCHULZ Jutta "Total synthesis of 5-acetoxy-6-methoxykawain" Seite 642, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-No. 186 721x | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 13, 25. September 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA MIHAILOVIC Mihailo L, CEKOVIC Zivorad, STANKOVIC Jezdimir, DJOKIC-MAZINJANIN Silvija, MARINKOVIC Dragan, KONSTANTINOVIC Stanimir " Reactions with lead tetraacetate. 37. The formation of cyclic ethers from olefinic alcohols. IV. The oxidative cyclization of 4-penten-1-ol by means of tetravalent lead compounds" Seite 866, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-No. 108 939a | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 86, No. 1, 3. Janner 1977, Columbus, Ohio, USA KUWAJIMA Isao, MINAMI Naoki, SATO Toshio "A conveniant method for the preparation of b-hydroxy esters" Seite 423, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung-No. 4 902u | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 13, 25. September 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA, MIHAILOVIC M.L., CEKOVIC Z., STANKOVIC J., DJOKIC-MAZINJANIN S., MARINKOVIC D., KONSTANTINOVIC St., "Reactions with lead tetraacetate. 37. The formation of cyclic ethers from olefinic alcohols. IV. The oxidative cyclization of 4-penten-1-o1 by means of tetravalent lead compounds", Seite 866, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung No.108 939a |