EP0119460 - Hydraulic energy-conversion device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rineer, Arthur E. P. O. Box 115 Beulah Michigan 49617 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states Rineer, Arthur E. P. O. Box 115 Beulah Michigan 49617 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101477.2 | 14.02.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | US19830467216 | 17.02.1983 Original published format: US 467216 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0119460 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0119460 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/46, F04C15/00 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
F04C15/0042 (EP);
F04C15/00 (EP);
F04C2/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Anlage zur Umwandlung hydraulischer Energie | [1984/39] | English: | Hydraulic energy-conversion device | [1984/39] | French: | Appareil de conversion d'énergie hydraulique | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 31.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/34] | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB484040 [ ]; | GB315376 [ ]; | US1684274 [ ]; | US3289602 [ ] |