blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0121062

EP0121062 - Rack bar control, especially for actuating windows [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.1987
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johannes Lock Windenfabrik und Maschinenbau
D-7943 Ertingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/41]For all designated states
Johannes Lock Windenfabrik und Maschinenbau
D-7943 Ertingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fluhr, Berthold
Salem-Scheuer-Strasse 30
D-7943 Ertingen / DE
02 / Lock, Freimut
INdustriestrasse 2
D-7943 Ertingen / DE
[1984/41]
Representative(s)RavensPAT Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Großtobeler Straße 39
88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Former [1984/41]Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth
Seestrasse 42
D-88214 Ravensburg / DE
Application number, filing date84101484.814.02.1984
[1984/41]
Priority number, dateEP1983010193328.02.1983         Original published format: EP 83101933
[1984/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0121062
Date:10.10.1984
Language:DE
[1984/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0121062
Date:09.04.1986
Language:DE
[1986/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1984
ClassificationIPC:E05F11/14, F16H19/00, A01G9/24
[1984/41]
CPC:
F16H19/04 (EP); A01G9/241 (EP); E05F11/14 (EP);
E05F11/32 (EP); E05F17/00 (EP); E05Y2900/11 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP); Y02A40/25 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1984/41]
TitleGerman:Zahnstangentrieb, insbesondere zur Betätigung von Fensterflügeln[1984/41]
English:Rack bar control, especially for actuating windows[1984/41]
French:Commande à crémaillère, en particulier pour l'actionnement des fenêtres[1984/41]
Examination procedure30.08.1984Examination requested  [1984/46]
01.08.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.09.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.1985Fee for grant paid
07.11.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2204167  (EHRENREICH & CIE A [DE]);
 [A]US3267751  (LITTMANN JOSEPH C);
 [A]GB263406  (ROBERTS ARTHUR);
 [A]FR1096184  (TELEFLEX PROD LTD);
 [A]FR2338370  (OCKHUIZEN HANDEL BV [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.