EP0122392 - Method for equipping a pipe with a lateral connecting piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1987 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leybold-Heraeus GmbH Bonner Strasse 504 Postfach 51 07 60 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | For all designated states Leybold-Heraeus GmbH Bonner Strasse 504 Postfach 51 07 60 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lüth, Armin Pommernweg 3 D-8751 Stockstadt / DE | [1984/43] | Representative(s) | Leineweber, Jürgen Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 D-50859 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1984/43] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Am Heidstamm 78 a D-5000 Köln 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101548.0 | 15.02.1984 | [1984/43] | Priority number, date | DE19833313897 | 16.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3313897 | [1984/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122392 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122392 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/08, F16L41/02, B21C37/29 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
F16L41/08 (EP);
B21C37/29 (EP);
B23B51/08 (EP);
B23P15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, LU, NL [1984/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausrüstung eines Rohres mit einem seitlichen Anschlussstutzen | [1984/43] | English: | Method for equipping a pipe with a lateral connecting piece | [1984/43] | French: | Méthode pour équiper un tuyau d'un raccord latéral | [1984/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 12.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU666368 ; | [Y]GB396499 (JOHN DWIGHT BALDWIN JR); | [Y]FR2508138 (BELMAR SNC ROBERTO MARI C [IT]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Sektion P,Q, Woche C 08, 2. April 1980 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London, Q 67; & SU-A-666368 (YAKUPAV), & SU666368 A 00000000 |