EP0119493 - Use of copolymers of 2-acrylamido-2-methylpropane sulfonic acid for improving retention and dewatering in the manufacture of paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehner, Donald Clifford 4059 Westmoreland Drive South Mobile Alabama 36609 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101696.7 | 18.02.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | US19830475794 | 16.03.1983 Original published format: US 475794 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119493 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D21H3/38, C08L33/26 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
D21H17/42 (EP);
D21F3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Copolymeren der 2-Acrylamido-2-Methylpropan-Sulfonsäure zur Verbesserung des Zurückhaltevermögens und der Entwässerung in der Papierherstellung | [1984/39] | English: | Use of copolymers of 2-acrylamido-2-methylpropane sulfonic acid for improving retention and dewatering in the manufacture of paper | [1984/39] | French: | Utilisation des copolymères de l'acide sulfonique de 2-acrylamido-2-méthylpropane pour améliorer la rétention et la déshydratation dans la fabrication du papier | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/48] | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4104226 (MELZER JAROSLAV, et al); | [A]US4147682 (YADA AKIRA, et al); | [A]US4077930 (LIM SIM KOEI, et al) |