EP0120330 - Digital computing apparatus and method for operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, Reed Adams 6589 Crystal Springs Dr. San Jose California 95120 / US | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Ahlman, Bertel IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84102102.5 | 29.02.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | US19830479384 | 28.03.1983 Original published format: US 479384 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120330 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120330 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120330 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F3/06 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F2003/0697 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/40] | G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/40] | Title | German: | Digitale Rechenvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Betreiben derselben | [1984/40] | English: | Digital computing apparatus and method for operating the same | [1984/40] | French: | Dispositif de calculateur numérique et méthode pour le faire fonctionner | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5731064 ; | [A]US3333251 (BRENZA JAMES G, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 20, no. 5, October 1977, page 1709, New York, US; R.F. ARNOLD et al.: "DASD space allocation" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 18, no. 5, October 1975, pages 1643-1647, New York, US; C.K. CHOW: "Algorithm to match a storage hierarchy to a cache memory of given access time and of yet undetermined capacity" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 100 (P-121)[978], 9th June 1982; & JP-A-57 31 064 (FUJITSU K.K.) 19-02-1982, & JP5731064 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 4, September 1981, pages 1945-1946, New York, US; L.H. WHEELER: "Method of specifying paging DASD allocation (SYSPAG) for optimizing system paging throughput and performance" |