EP0121780 - Apparatus for shaping a distal femoral surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Auburn, MI 48611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacey, James Allen 851 Georgia Avenue Winter Park Florida / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102489.6 | 08.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830473466 | 09.03.1983 Original published format: US 473466 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121780 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121780 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/14 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
A61B17/155 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bildung der Knieschenkeloberfläche | [1984/42] | English: | Apparatus for shaping a distal femoral surface | [1984/42] | French: | Appareil de conformation de la face distale du fémur | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/22] | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4409973 (NEUFELD JOHN A [US]) | [AP] - JOURNAL OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY, vol. 65-a, no. 3, March 1983, pages 293-309, Journal of Bone and Joint Surgery, Inc., Boston, Massachusetts, US; N.S. EFTEKHAR et al.: "Total knee-replacement arthroplasty" |