EP0120379 - Load changer for switching step windings of a three-phase transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 14.12.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Katzwanger Strasse 150 D-8500 Nürnberg 40 / DE | ||
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Deckerstrasse 1 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmann, Werner Endersbacherstrasse 36 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/42] |
Former [1984/40] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102606.5 | 09.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | DE19833310741 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3310741 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120379 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120379 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01F29/02, H01F21/12 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
H01F29/025 (EP);
H01H9/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Lastwähler zum Schalten von Stufenwicklungen eines Dreiphasen-Transformators | [1984/40] | English: | Load changer for switching step windings of a three-phase transformer | [1984/40] | French: | Sélecteur de charge pour commuter les enroulements à gradius de tranformateur triphasé | [1984/40] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1988
28.03.1988
ADMISSIBLE Scheubeck GmbH & Co Cranachweg 3 D-93051 Regensburg / DE | [1989/20] |
Former [1988/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1988
Maschinenfabrik Reinhausen Gebrüder Scheubeck GmbH & Co KG Falkensteinstrasse 8 D-8400 Regensburg / DE | 21.04.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.08.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 28.05.1989 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1990/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.03.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1268728 [ ] (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK); | DE1638484 [ ] (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK); | GB1337380 [ ] (SMIT NIJMEGEN ELECTROTEC); | DE2005189 [ ] |