EP0121798 - Dynamic type semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furuyama, Tohru 100 Fairview Square Apart., 3-G Ithaca, N.Y. 14850 / US | 02 /
Uchida, Yukimasa 15-1524, Maeda-Heights 511-2, Maeda-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102612.3 | 09.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | JP19830039550 | 10.03.1983 Original published format: JP 3955083 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121798 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121798 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121798 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/407, G11C5/00 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G11C11/4074 (EP,US);
G11C11/4087 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/42] | G11C11/24, G11C5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/42] | Title | German: | Dynamische Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [1984/42] | English: | Dynamic type semiconductor memory device | [1984/42] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire dynamique à semi-conducteur | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/42] | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4151610 (OCHII KIYOFUMI [JP], et al) |