Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0120389 | Global Dossier | 09.09.1987 | B1 | EP0120389 | 24.04.1985 | A3 | EP0120389 | 03.10.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4423083 | 18.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3466141D1 | 15.10.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4423083 | 18.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0578093B | 28.10.1993 | B2 | JPS59171037 | 27.09.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4423083 | 18.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR910003217B | 22.05.1991 | B1 | KR840008229 | 13.12.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4423083 | 18.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4712218 | 08.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4423083 | 18.03.1983 |