EP0130275 - Slide for the longitudinal adjustment of vehicle seats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.09.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Rob. Hammerstein GmbH Postfach 13 01 18 Merscheiderstrasse 167 D-42699 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states C. Rob. Hammerstein GmbH Postfach 13 01 18 Merscheiderstrasse 167 D-42699 Solingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Heinz Hammerstrasse 9 D-5650 Solinegen 11 / DE | 02 /
Becker, Burckhard, Dipl.-Ing. Obenkatternberg 25 D-5650 Solingen / DE | 03 /
Frohnhaus, Ernst-Reiner Hammerstrasse 13 D-5650 Solingen 11 / DE | 04 /
Gedig, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Hammerstrasse 28 D-5650 Solingen 11 / DE | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 D-50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102711.3 | 13.03.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | DE19833319815 | 01.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3319815 | DE19833321869 | 16.06.1983 Original published format: DE 3321869 | [1985/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130275 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130275 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130275 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60N1/08 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
B60N2/072 (EP);
F16C29/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Längsführung, insbesondere für Längsverstellvorrichtungen von Fahrzeugsitzen | [1985/02] | English: | Slide for the longitudinal adjustment of vehicle seats | [1985/02] | French: | Glissière pour réglage longitudinal de sièges de véhicules | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 13.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.1989
12.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1353 D-96403 Coburg / DE | 02
30.08.1989
19.09.1989
ADMISSIBLE Alusuisse-Lonza Holding A.G. CH-3965 Chippis (Valais) / CH Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.1989
12.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1353 D-96403 Coburg / DE | ||
02
30.08.1989
19.09.1989
ADMISSIBLE Alusuisse-Lonza Holding A.G. CH-3965 Chippis (Valais) / CH Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | |||
Former [1989/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.1989
12.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1353 D-96403 Coburg / DE | ||
02
30.08.1989
19.09.1989
ADMISSIBLE Alusuisse-Lonza Holding A.G. CH-3965 Chippis (Valais) / CH Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. Hiebsch & Peege Patentanwälte Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | |||
Former [1989/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.08.1989
12.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1353 D-96403 Coburg / DE | 17.10.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.02.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.04.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/46] | 17.04.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.06.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2702582 (POTTER ALBERT T); | [YD]GB2108380 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB); | [A]GB2108836 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB); | [A]GB1485050 (BIRNAM PROD LTD); | [A]GB2074442 (COX LTD T I) |