EP0125421 - Method of joining the end fin made of a vulcanised elastomer of an insulating element to a metal end fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/47] | Method of joining the end fin made of a vulcanised elastomer of an insulating element to a metal end fitting, and an organic electrical insulator constructed by this method | ||
[1987/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERAVER Société anonyme dite: 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states CERAVER Société anonyme dite: 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thevenet, Guy Le Bourg F-63310 Beaumont-Les-Randan / FR | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102828.5 | 15.03.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | FR19830004450 | 18.03.1983 Original published format: FR 8304450 | [1984/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125421 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125421 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/38 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
H01B17/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbindung des Endschirmes aus vulkanisiertem Elastomer eines isolierenden Elementes mit einer Endmetallarmatur | [1987/02] | English: | Method of joining the end fin made of a vulcanised elastomer of an insulating element to a metal end fitting | [1987/02] | French: | Procédé de liaison de l'ailette terminale en élastomère vulcanisé d'un élément isolant avec une ferrure d'extrémité | [1987/02] |
Former [1984/47] | Verfahren zur Verbindung des Endschirmes aus vulkanisiertem Elastomer eines isolierenden Elementes mit einer Endmetallarmatur und durch dieses Verfahren hergestellter organischer elektrischer Isolator | ||
Former [1984/47] | Method of joining the end fin made of a vulcanised elastomer of an insulating element to a metal end fitting, and an organic electrical insulator constructed by this method | ||
Former [1984/47] | Procédé de liaison de l'ailette terminale en élastomère vulcanisé d'un élément isolant avec une ferrure d'extrémité, et isolateur électrique organique obtenu par ce procédé | Examination procedure | 14.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 13.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE412448 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK); | [A]DE413266 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK); | [A]GB1126411 (TRANS DEV LTD); | [A]GB1233310 ; | [A]FR2360968 (CERAVER [FR]); | [Y]DE2855211 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]GB2041444 (LIST H); | [AD]GB2053583 (CERAVER) |