EP0121162 - Flame-resistant paper and a process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herr, Alfons Karl Erasmusstrasse 9 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | 02 /
Staendeke, Horst, Dr. Alte Honrather Strasse 22 D-5204 Lohmar 21 / DE | 03 /
Dany, Franz-Josef, Dr. Heddinghovener Strasse 47 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | 04 /
Kandler, Joachim, Dr. Amselweg 10 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | [1984/41] | Application number, filing date | 84102843.4 | 15.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | DE19833311770 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311770 | [1984/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121162 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121162 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121162 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D21H3/66, D21D3/00, C09K21/00 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
D21H21/34 (EP);
C09K21/14 (EP);
D21H17/33 (EP);
D21H17/67 (EP);
D21H5/0002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/41] | D21H3/66, D21D3/00, C09K3/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/41] | Title | German: | Flammwidriges Papier und ein Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1984/41] | English: | Flame-resistant paper and a process for its manufacture | [1984/41] | French: | Papier résistant au feu et un procédé pour sa préparation | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 14.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.03.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53073898 ; | [A]JP56010582 ; | [A]US3671376 (OKAZAKI TAKAYOSHI, et al); | [YD]DE1771693 ; | [AD]DE2949537 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0059850 (SAFFA SPA [IT]) | [A] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF INST. OF PAPER CHEM., Band 50, Nr. 5, November 1979, Seite 514, Nr. 4813, Appleton, Wisc., US; & JP-A-53 073 898 (Y. OGAWA et al.) 30.06.1978, & JP53073898 A 00000000 | [A] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, Band 52, Nr. 2, August 1981, Seite 242, Nr. 2136, Appleton, Wisc., US; & JP-A-56 010 582 (S. MASUDA) 03.02.1981, & JP56010582 A 00000000 |