EP0119602 - Holder for a wireless telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.08.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schön, Siegfried Tulpenweg 10 D-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1984/39] | Application number, filing date | 84102869.9 | 15.03.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | DE19833309877 | 18.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3309877 | [1984/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119602 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/72 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
H04M1/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/6033 (EP,US);
H04M1/6041 (EP,US);
H04M1/72502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI, NL [1984/39] | Title | German: | Aufnahme für schnurloses Telefon | [1984/39] | English: | Holder for a wireless telephone | [1984/39] | French: | Logement pour téléphone sans fil | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 13.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/21] | 05.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1987/39] | 02.05.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1930532 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG); | [A]DE2508102 (SIEMENS AG); | [AP]US4395591 (KACZKOS JOHN E) |