EP0123112 - Chromone- and thiochromone-substituted 1,4-dihydropyridines, processes for their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical preparations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.1989 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldmann, Siegfried, Dr. Kuckuckstrasse 41 D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 02 /
Franckowiak, Gerhard, Dr. Henselweg 10 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 03 /
Schramm, Matthias, Dr. Paffrather Strasse 38 D-5000 Köln / DE | 04 /
Thomas, Günter, Dr. Claudiusweg 9 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 05 /
Gross, Rainer, Dr. Platzhoffstrasse 23 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1984/44] | Application number, filing date | 84102903.6 | 16.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | DE19833311005 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311005 | [1984/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123112 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123112 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123112 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/04, C07D409/04, C07D405/14, A61K31/445 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
C07D211/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Chromon- und thiochromonsubstituierte 1,4-Dihydropyridinderivate, mehrere Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung in Arzneimitteln | [1984/44] | English: | Chromone- and thiochromone-substituted 1,4-dihydropyridines, processes for their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical preparations | [1984/44] | French: | 1,4-Dihydropyridines chromone- ou thiochromone substitués, leurs procédés de préparation et leur application comme médicaments | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 09.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1042480 (UPJOHN CO); | [E]EP0157324 (BAYER AG [DE]) |