EP0155332 - Intermediate work piece support in a transfer press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1989 [1989/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L. SCHULER GmbH Postfach 12 22 D-73012 Göppingen / DE | [1985/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Hermann Möckenweg 6 D-7332 Eislingen / DE | 02 /
Dumschat, Helmut Wagnerstrasse 34 D-7322 Donzdorf / DE | 03 /
Strommer, Kurt Tegelbergstrasse 2 D-7343 Kuchen / DE | 04 /
Müller, Sieghard Adlerstrasse 26 D-7321 Ottenbach / DE | [1985/39] | Application number, filing date | 84103029.9 | 20.03.1984 | [1985/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0155332 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155332 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/05 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
B21D43/057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Zwischenablage in einer Transferpresse | [1985/39] | English: | Intermediate work piece support in a transfer press | [1985/39] | French: | Support intermédiaire de pièce dans une presse-transfert | [1985/39] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 24.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.03.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5636346 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPS58100927 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AD]DE3245603 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF) | [AD] - BLECH . ROHRE . PROFILE, Band 26, Nr. 8, August 1979, Seiten 380-387, Coburg, DE; H.L. HILBERT: "Einzelpressen und mechanisierte Einzelpressen" |