EP0129003 - Cosmetic and dermatological compositions containing 1-alpha-hydroxycholecalciferol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1993 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. 46, Jabotinsky Street Jerusalem 91042 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM 46, Jabotinsky Street, P.O. Box 4279 Jerusalem 91042 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dikstein, Shabtay 7 Habanai Street Beth Hakerem Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
Hartzshtark, Abraham 11 Basel Street Kiriat Moshe Jerusalem / IL | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103060.4 | 20.03.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | IL19950000681 | 22.03.1983 Original published format: IL 68195 | IL19960000681 | 22.03.1983 Original published format: IL 68196 | [1984/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129003 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129003 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129003 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0129003 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K31/59 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/59 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61Q7/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/29] |
Former [1984/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kosmetische und dermatologische Präparate, die 1 alpha-Hydroxycholecalciferol enthalten | [1984/52] | English: | Cosmetic and dermatological compositions containing 1-alpha-hydroxycholecalciferol | [1984/52] | French: | Compositions cosmétiques et dermatologiques contenant du 1-alpha-hydroxycholecalciférol | [1984/52] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/50] | 14.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1990
16.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE The General Hospital Corporation Fruit Street US-Boston, Massachussetts 02114 / US Opponent's representative Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.1990
16.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE The General Hospital Corporation Fruit Street US-Boston, Massachussetts 02114 / US Opponent's representative Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | 06.06.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.03.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.06.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.06.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.12.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2181781 (SYNTEX CORP [PA]); | [Y]DE2240187 (ALBIN JEREB FRANZ DR); | [A]GB2005684 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [A]GB1548837 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [X]US4335120 (HOLICK MICHAEL F, et al); | [X]GB2098066 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND); | [A]CH644518 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) | [X] - KLINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT, vol. 59, 1981, Springer-Verlag, K. SCHAEFER, D. VON HERRATH: "Vitamin D 1980 - Eine Bestands-aufnahme", pages 525-534 | [Y] - W.O. FOYE: "Principles of Medicinal Chemistry", second edition, 1981, LEA & FEBIGER, Philadelphia, pages 667-670 | [A] - H. JANISTYN: "Handbuch der Kosmetika und Riechstoffe", third edition, vol. 1, 1978, DR. ALFRED HÜTHIG VERLAG, Heidelberg, pages 984-985 |