EP0121177 - Device for recovering a pulse from a signal stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moustakas, Steven, Dr. Agnesstrasse 2 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Witte, Hans-Hermann, Dr. Hippelstrasse 15 D-8000 München 82 / DE | [1984/41] | Application number, filing date | 84103063.8 | 20.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | DE19833311677 | 30.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311677 | [1984/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121177 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121177 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
H04L7/027 (EP,US);
H04L7/0276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung eines Taktes aus einer Signalfolge | [1984/41] | English: | Device for recovering a pulse from a signal stream | [1984/41] | French: | Dispositif pour la récupération d'un rythme à partir d'une suite de signaux | [1984/41] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 08.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/18] | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3968328 (TSUCHIYA YOSHIKAZU, et al); | [X]EP0028001 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |