EP0121833 - Seamless product for reinforcing and stabilizing V-belts and methods to produce same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIGHLAND INDUSTRIES, INC. 422 Gallimore Dairy Road Greensboro, North Carolina 27409 / US | [1991/23] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states Burlington Industries, Inc. 3330 West Friendly Avenue Greensboro North Carolina 27420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGee, James Newton, Jr. Route 2, Box 294 Pleasant Garden North Carolina 27313 / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103081.0 | 21.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830484367 | 12.04.1983 Original published format: US 484367 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121833 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121833 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121833 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/58, D04H1/70 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
D04H1/64 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2098 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Nahtloses Produkt zum Verstärken und Stabilisieren von Keilriemen und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [1984/42] | English: | Seamless product for reinforcing and stabilizing V-belts and methods to produce same | [1984/42] | French: | Produit sans couture pour le renforcement et la stabilisation de courroies trapézoidales et méthodes pour le fabriquer | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3090716 (STEVENS BENNIE A); | [A]GB1000821 (CHICOPEE MFG CORP); | [A]GB1175530 (FIBRELOCK FABRICS LTD); | [A]US3620897 (TANIMOTO KATSUKIYO, et al) |