EP0121834 - Antivibration device, particularly apt for an automotive engine support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrie Pirelli S.p.A. Piazzale Cadorna, 5 I-20123 Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states INDUSTRIE PIRELLI S.p.A. Piazzale Cadorna, 5 I-20123 Milan / IT | ||
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states INDUSTRIE PIRELLI S.p.A. Piazzale Cadorna 5 I-20123 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tangorra, Giorgio Via Ramazzotti, 12 Monza (Milan) / IT | 02 /
Robecchi, Edoardo Via Chiesa, 56 Sesto S. Giovanni (Milan) / IT | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Mariani, Giorgio, et al INDUSTRIE PIRELLI S.p.A. Direzione Brevetti Piazzale Cadorna, 5 I-20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Mariani, Giorgio, Dr., et al INDUSTRIE PIRELLI S.p.A. Direzione Brevetti Piazzale Cadorna, 5 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84103092.7 | 21.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | IT19830020503 | 08.04.1983 Original published format: IT 2050383 | [1984/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121834 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121834 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16F3/10, B60K5/12, F16F7/00 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
B60K5/125 (EP,US);
F16F3/10 (EP,US);
F16F7/00 (EP,US);
F16F2230/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/42] | Title | German: | Antischwingungsvorrichtung, insbesondere für ein Lager eines Fahrzeugmotors | [1984/42] | English: | Antivibration device, particularly apt for an automotive engine support | [1984/42] | French: | Dispositif d'anti-vibrations, en particulier pour support de moteur de véhicule | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 13.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 25.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/01] | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2145891 (RICE JR JOHN V); | [A]GB965868 (GOMMA ANTIVIBRANTI APPLIC); | [A]DE1228864 (RUBBER AND PLASTICS RES ASS OF); | [Y]GB1213433 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2307567 (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG); | [Y]GB1368296 (HARTWELL CORPOTATION); | [A]GB1447005 (HARTWELL CORP) |