EP0123893 - Method and circuit for picture error correction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1988 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strehl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Drozzaweg 15 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1984/45] | Application number, filing date | 84103318.6 | 26.03.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | DE19833311911 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311911 | [1984/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123893 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123893 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/13 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
H04N5/21 (EP,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Bildfehlerkorrektur | [1984/45] | English: | Method and circuit for picture error correction | [1984/45] | French: | Procédé et circuit pour la correction des erreurs d'image | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.08.1986 | [1988/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2553269 (LICENTIA GMBH) |