Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] |
14.03.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.04.1987 [1987/18] |
06.12.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.02.1985 [1985/06] |
31.08.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.10.1984 [1984/44] |