EP0123172 - A mixer tap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUGLER Fonderie et Robinetterie S.A. 19, avenue de la Jonction Case postale 240 CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | [1984/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crinel, Lucien 97 B, Route de Genève F-74240 Gaillard / FR | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Micheli, Michel Pierre, et al MICHELI & CIE Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Micheli, Michel-Pierre, et al MICHELI & CIE, Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 84103600.7 | 31.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | GB19830009745 | 11.04.1983 Original published format: GB 8309745 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123172 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123172 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/02, F16K11/00, B23P15/00 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
B23P15/001 (EP);
F16K19/00 (EP);
F16K27/0263 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/44] | F16K27/02, F16K19/00, B23P15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1984/44] | Title | German: | Mischventil | [1984/44] | English: | A mixer tap | [1984/44] | French: | Mélangeur | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 12.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2104625 ; | [A]FR1598379 |