EP0123173 - Assembly line, particularly suited for the production of leather and similar goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1989 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anzani, Giuseppe Via L. Manara 84 Fraz. S. Lorenzo I-20015 Parabiago / IT | [1984/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. Via Ariberto 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Lecce, Giovanni Ufficio Internazionale Calciati S.r.l. Via G. Negri 10 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84103645.2 | 03.04.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | IT19830020771 | 22.04.1983 Original published format: IT 2077183 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123173 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123173 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123173 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A43D111/00, A43D95/12 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
A43D95/12 (EP);
A43D111/00 (KR);
A43D117/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/44] | Title | German: | Montagelinie, insbesondere für die Herstellung von Produkten aus Leder und dgl. | [1984/44] | English: | Assembly line, particularly suited for the production of leather and similar goods | [1984/44] | French: | Ligne d'assemblage, en particulier pour la production d'articles en cuir et similaires | [1984/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 15.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB386554 (EDMOND PLE, et al); | [Y]FR811824 (PAUL DAILLOUX ETS); | [X]FR1004423 ; | [X]US3120666 (MURPHY RICHARD S) |