EP0121896 - Method of and device for bending bar-shaped materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruhl, Heinz Manigoldstrasse 5 D-97199 Ochsenfurt / DE | [1989/30] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states Zahlaus, Helmut Königsberger Strasse 27 D-6239 Kriftel/Ts. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahlaus, Helmut Königsberger Strasse 27 D-6239 Kriftel/Ts. / DE | [1989/29] |
Former [1984/42] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1985/04] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1984/42] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Salzstrasse 11a D-63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103662.7 | 04.04.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | DE19833312397 | 06.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3312397 | [1984/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121896 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121896 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121896 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0121896 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B21D11/12 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
B21D11/12 (EP,US);
Y10S72/702 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Biegen von stabförmigen Materialien | [1984/42] | English: | Method of and device for bending bar-shaped materials | [1984/42] | French: | Procédé pour et dispostif à cintrer des matériaux en forme de barre | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 13.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.05.1988
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Muhr und Bender Maschinenbau GmbH Kölner Strasse 99 D-57439 Attendorn / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter, et al, et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.05.1988
09.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Muhr und Bender Maschinenbau GmbH Kölner Strasse 99 D-57439 Attendorn / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, Hans Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Weidener, Postfach 10 13 54 D-45013 Essen / DE | 19.09.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.03.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.04.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.04.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.12.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.12.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.07.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3481177 (JOYCE JAMES E); | [A]DE1752716 (STEGMANN ERNST); | [A]US3805576 (BRAUER E); | [A]DE1552970 | by applicant | DE3206673 |