EP0134394 - Measuring transducer with strain gauges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1989 [1989/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1985/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kant, Bernhard Berliner Strasse 9 D-6236 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
Porth, Wolfgang Röhrborngasse 70 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 60 / DE | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Könekamp, Herbert Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Könekamp, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103888.8 | 07.04.1984 | [1985/12] | Priority number, date | DE19833325539 | 15.07.1983 Original published format: DE 3325539 | [1985/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134394 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134394 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134394 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/04, G01L1/22, G01L1/26 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
G01L9/006 (EP,US);
G01L1/2231 (EP,US);
G01L1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/12] | Title | German: | Messumformer mit Dehnungsmessstreifen | [1985/12] | English: | Measuring transducer with strain gauges | [1985/12] | French: | Transducteur de mesure à jauges de contrainte | [1985/12] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 05.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH434803 (DIFFUSION D APP DE MESURE ET D [FR]); | [A]US3869906 (ANDERSSON JOHN ERIK); | [A]DE3004031 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | [A]FR2490814 (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE) [FR]) |