EP0124032 - Radial piston compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöning, Rudolf Martin-Luther-Strasse 48 D-8740 Bad Neustadt/Saale / DE | 02 /
Schönwald, Siegfried Burgstrasse 18 D-8740 Bad Neustadt/Saale / DE | [1984/45] | Application number, filing date | 84104429.0 | 18.04.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | DE19833316106 | 03.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3316106 | [1984/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0124032 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0124032 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/06 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
F04B27/0619 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | Radialkolbenverdichter | [1984/45] | English: | Radial piston compressor | [1984/45] | French: | Compresseur à pistons radiaux | [1984/45] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/08] | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR566061 ; | [A]US1939057 ; | [A]US2504841 ; | [AD]DE3120812 |