EP0126963 - Process for the production of cleaning agent tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kruse, Hans Am Hallenbad 44 D-4052 Korschenbroich / DE | 02 /
Witthaus, Martin, Dr. Burgmüllerstrasse 7 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Altenschöpfer, Theodor, Dr. Einsteinstrasse 3 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 04 /
Schumann, Klaus, Dr. Keplerstrasse 33 D-4006 Erkrath 2 / DE | [1984/49] | Application number, filing date | 84104535.4 | 21.04.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | DE19833315950 | 02.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3315950 | [1984/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126963 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126963 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D17/06 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
C11D7/16 (EP,US);
C11D17/0091 (EP,US);
C11D3/08 (EP,US);
C11D7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/52] |
Former [1984/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Reinigungsmitteltabletten | [1984/49] | English: | Process for the production of cleaning agent tablets | [1984/49] | French: | Procédé pour la production de comprimés d'agent de nettoyage | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/17] | 18.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3417024 (SEYMORE GOLDWASSER); | [X]EP0002293 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [AD]DE2857001 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [AD]DE2913145 (HENKEL KGAA) |