EP0123308 - Process for locally matting synthetic coatings, and products obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROFLOOR S.A. 1 Rue Neuve L-9501 Wiltz / LU | [1984/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Courtoy, Jean-François 49 rue des Charretiers Wiltz / LU | 02 /
Marchal, Daniel 4 Place de la Paix Esch-sur-Alzette / LU | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Freylinger, Ernest T., et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Freylinger, Ernest T., et al Office de Brevets Ernest T. Freylinger 321, route d'Arlon Boîte Postale 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 84104555.2 | 21.04.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | LU19830084765 | 25.04.1983 Original published format: LU 84765 | LU19830084957 | 11.08.1983 Original published format: LU 84957 | [1984/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123308 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123308 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D06N7/00 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
D06N7/0028 (EP,US);
B44C1/205 (EP,US);
D06N7/0013 (EP,US);
D06N7/0023 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur örtlichen Mattierung von synthetischen Beschichtungen und so erhaltene Produkte | [1984/44] | English: | Process for locally matting synthetic coatings, and products obtained | [1984/44] | French: | Procédé de matification locale de revêtements synthétiques et produits obtenus | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 06.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1061259 (BLANCHIMENT ET APPRETS DE TARA); | [A]US3310422 (PETRY ROBERT K); | [A]FR1538506 (ICI LTD); | [A]GB1159645 (GAF CORP [US]); | [A]FR2235796 (MARLEY TILE AG [CH]); | [A]US4068030 (WITMAN JACK H); | [AD]US4273819 (SCHMIDLE CLAUDE J, et al) |