EP0125558 - Apparatus and method for providing direct cool beam incident light on dental targets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY International Inc. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL, INC. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonser, Donald I. 1749 Crescent Road York Pennsylvania 17403 / US | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84104908.3 | 02.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | US19830492286 | 06.05.1983 Original published format: US 492286 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125558 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125558 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/00, A61N5/06, F21L15/02, C08F2/48 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
A61C19/004 (EP,US);
G02B6/4298 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/47] | A61C19/00, F21L15/02, C08F2/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Bestrahlen zahnärztlicher Ziele mit direkt auffallendem Kaltlicht | [1984/47] | English: | Apparatus and method for providing direct cool beam incident light on dental targets | [1984/47] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour exposer des cibles dentaires à un rayon de lumière froide directement incidente | [1984/47] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 11.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/18] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE305899 ; | [A]DE7106262U ; | [AD]US4112335 (GONSER DONALD I); | [A]EP0003312 (ESPE PHARM PRAEP [DE]); | [AD]US4229658 (GONSER DONALD I); | [A]GB2044908 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD); | [A]DE2920204 (NATH GUENTHER); | [A]DE3009171 (NATH GUENTHER, et al); | [A]EP0046939 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]); | [A]DE8228416U |