EP0125561 - Data-processing system having multi-buffer adapter between a system channel and an input/output bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burns, Charles Sidney R.R. 1, Box 259 Mazeppa Minnesota 55956 / US | 02 /
Crabtree, Michael Ray 4202 Second Street N.W. Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 03 /
Gourneau, Dwight Allen 3009 17th Avenue N.W. Rochester Minnesota / US | 04 /
Hinkel, Scott Wayne 1222 Northern Heights Drive Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 05 /
Lerom, George Albert 112212 Taterwood Drive Austin Texas 78750 / US | 06 /
Mayfield, Michael John 1306 September Drive Austin Texas 78753 / US | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Lettieri, Fabrizio, et al c/o IBM Semea S.r.l. Direzione Brevetti Circonvallazione Idroscalo P.O. Box 137 I-20090 Segrate (Milano) / IT | [1990/02] |
Former [1984/47] | Savi, Camillo c/o IBM Semea S.r.l. Direzione Brevetti Circonvallazione Idroscalo P.O. Box 137 I-20090 Segrate (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 84104930.7 | 03.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | US19830494250 | 13.05.1983 Original published format: US 494250 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125561 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125561 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125561 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/12 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
G06F13/282 (EP,US);
G06F13/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/47] | G06F3/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/47] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem mit einer Anpassungseinheit mit mehreren Puffern zwischen einem Systemkanal und einem Eingangs-/Ausgangsbus | [1990/44] | English: | Data-processing system having multi-buffer adapter between a system channel and an input/output bus | [1984/47] | French: | Système de traitement de données comportant un adaptateur multi-tampon entre un canal de système et un bus d'entrée/sortie | [1984/47] |
Former [1984/47] | Datenverarbeitungssystem mit einer Anpassungseinheit mit mehreren Puffern zswischen einem Systemkanal und einem Eingangs-/Ausgangsbus | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4040026 (GERNELLE FRANCOIS); | [A]GB2089076 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4378588 (KATZMAN JAMES A, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 10, March 1982, pages 5295-5297, New York, US; G.W. HAVELICK et al.: "Automatic channel request for data transfers" | [XP] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 11, April 1984, pages 5962-5965, New York, US; C.S. BURNS et al.: "Device-level control bus for I/O devices in a data processor" |