EP0148310 - Bank note processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morishita, Muneki 1-14-2, Kawazoe Takatsuki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Hiroyuki 39-56, Miyamadai 1-chome Nishi-Tsutsujigaoka Kameoka-shi Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Matsusaka, Horoji 6-288, Sunada Iseda-cho Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105064.4 | 04.05.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | JP19830079913 | 06.05.1983 Original published format: JP 7991383 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148310 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148310 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148310 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G07D1/00, G07D9/00, G07F7/10 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G07D11/14 (EP,US);
G07D11/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/29] | G07D1/00, G07D9/00, G07F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Banknoten | [1985/29] | English: | Bank note processing device | [1985/29] | French: | Dispositif pour la manipulation de billets de banque | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1984 | Examination requested [1985/29] | 30.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | EP0024704 [ ] (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | DE3223116 [ ] (LAUREL BANK MACHINE CO [JP]) |