EP0125586 - Oscillator circuit for television receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Gerhard Reutestrasse 19 D-7735 Dauchingen / DE | 02 /
Kirschner, Erich Drosselstrasse 10 D-7210 Göllsdorf / DE | [1984/47] | Application number, filing date | 84105078.4 | 05.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | DE19833316881 | 07.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3316881 | [1984/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125586 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125586 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125586 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03B5/12 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
H03B5/1231 (EP);
H03B5/1203 (EP);
H03B5/1243 (EP);
H03B2200/0008 (EP);
H03B2200/004 (EP);
H03B2200/0042 (EP);
H03B2200/0048 (EP);
H03B2200/0056 (EP);
H03B2201/0208 (EP);
H03B2201/03 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, LU [1984/47] | Title | German: | Oszillatorschaltung für Fernsehempfangsgeräte | [1984/47] | English: | Oscillator circuit for television receivers | [1984/47] | French: | Circuit oscillateur pour des récepteurs de télévision | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/51] | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP58095419 ; | [A]DE2816786 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]DE2701353 ; | [Y]DE2918636 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG); | [A]DE2929897 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG); | [Y]DE2846411 ; | [A]DE3017607 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 194 (E-195)[1339], 24. August 1983; & JP-A-58 095 419 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) 07.06.1983 (Kat. A), & JP58095419 A 00000000 |