EP0126375 - Method and device for the transmission of digital luminance and chrominance television signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Starck, Alexander, Dipl.-Phys. Terhallestrasse 45 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1984/48] | Application number, filing date | 84105202.0 | 08.05.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | DE19833317115 | 10.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3317115 | [1984/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126375 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126375 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04N11/04 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
H04N19/90 (EP,US);
H04N11/046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/48] | H04N9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung von digitalen Luminanz- und Chrominanzsignalen des Fernsehens | [1984/48] | English: | Method and device for the transmission of digital luminance and chrominance television signals | [1984/48] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de transmission de signaux de luminance et de chrominance numériques de télévision | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 17.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2246507 (MARCONI CO LTD, et al); | [A]DE2434471 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [A] - SMPTE JOURNAL, Band 89, Nr. 4, April 1980, Seiten 244-248, Scarsdale, US; R. BURKHARDT et al.: "Digital television transmission with 34 Mbit/s" | Examination | - Interim Report III/81, Independent Broadcasting Authority |