EP0129700 - Fine particles of polyvinyl chloride and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 9-11 Horidome-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 9-11 Horidome-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kidoh, Kunizoh 29-2, Oritachi Nishiki-Machi Iwaki-Shi Fukushima-Ken / JP | 02 /
Wakamori, Hideki 3-5-15, Nakamukai Nishiki-Machi Iwaki-Shi Fukushima-Ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Fujio 55-3, Toriinishi Nishiki-Machi Iwaki-Shi Fukushima-Ken / JP | 04 /
Iwasaki, Takao 16-1, Maehara Nishiki-Machi Iwaki-Shi Fukushima-Ken / JP | [1985/01] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/01] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 D-80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105673.2 | 18.05.1984 | [1985/01] | Priority number, date | JP19830091028 | 24.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9102883 | [1985/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0129700 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0129700 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129700 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08F114/06 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
C08F114/06 (EP,US);
C08F14/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/01] | Title | German: | Feinteiliges Polyvinylchlorid und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1985/01] | English: | Fine particles of polyvinyl chloride and process for producing the same | [1985/01] | French: | Grains fins de chlorure de polyvinyle et procédé pour sa préparation | [1985/01] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4029863 (LEMPER ANTHONY L) |