EP0127140 - Information holding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitajima, Masaaki 989-3, Isobe-cho Hitachiohta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawakami, Hideaki 1386-8, Senba-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Nagae, Yoshiharu 2670-13, Kanesawa-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Takasaka, Masahiro 600-43, Kotobuki-cho Hitachiohta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/49] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105941.3 | 24.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | JP19830090716 | 25.05.1983 Original published format: JP 9071683 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127140 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127140 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127140 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/42 | [1992/45] | CPC: |
G11C11/22 (EP,US);
G11C11/24 (EP,US);
G11C16/02 (EP,US);
G11C7/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/49] | G11C13/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/49] | Title | German: | Datenhalteanordnung | [1984/49] | English: | Information holding device | [1984/49] | French: | Dispositif de maintien d'information | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4242736 (RAFFEL JACK I [US], et al); | [A]US4221471 (GURTLER RICHARD W) | Examination | EP0117535 | GB812620 | - W. TRIEBEL et al "Handbook of Semiconductor and Bubble Memories", 1982, p. 39-41 |