EP0139825 - Improvements in controlling ammonia emissions for diazo developing equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.Q.O. Holding Company, Inc. 111 West Second Street Jamestown, N.Y. 14701 / US | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feitzinger, Eduard 3209 Briarcliff Avenue Vestal New York 13850 / US | 02 /
Seminski, Robert B. 3002 Phyllis Street Endwell New York 13760 / US | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84106094.0 | 29.05.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | US19830534095 | 20.09.1983 Original published format: US 534095 | [1985/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0139825 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0139825 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03D7/00 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
G03D7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/19] | Title | German: | Kontrolle der Ammoniakemission in Diazo entwickelvorrichtungen | [1985/19] | English: | Improvements in controlling ammonia emissions for diazo developing equipment | [1985/19] | French: | Contrôle de l'émission d'ammoniaque pour appareils de développement diazo | [1985/19] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/21] | 05.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8002465 (HEWELT R [US]); | [YD]US3900862 (BENNETT FRANK PRESCOTT, et al); | [A]US4377331 (SEELENBINDER TERRY G, et al); | [A]US4135803 (VAN HOUWELINGEN HENDRIK) |